+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Held
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate second read
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
6-23approp_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 21
January 29, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2008: Water and Agriculture: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3