+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAT (ref Bill) adopted
- Gabaldon flr amend (ref TAT) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 17, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 16
May 4, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
February 23, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 22, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 10
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor