+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 46
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: FIIR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate first read
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: FII
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Konopnicki
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Konopnicki floor amendment, refrence to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-14 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Konopnicki floor amendment, refrence to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2008: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 29, 2008: Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor