+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Judd
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 18, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1