+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- FMFR (ref Bill) adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES - passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
Senate Proposed Amendment
Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 18
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 7
April 12, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
March 3, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 3, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 3, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2016: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor