+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 94 rfeir
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 27 2 1 0 passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator pierce motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass hb 2585 with the required three-fourths vote pursuant to article iv, part 1, section 1, constitution of arizona on third reading on april 5, 2011. motion carried.
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y failed
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pm
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 2, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
February 7, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2011: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor