+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor