+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pm
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 4, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor