+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Amended by JUD - passed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
February 4, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor