+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 60
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Friese
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 2, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor