+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Jud
- Public Safety and Human Services: Withdrawn
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 4
January 25, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 25, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor