+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:58PM.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (12)
February 23, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 23, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 11
February 4, 2016: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 4, 2016: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor