+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 122
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- COW motion
- Sen gould to show the bill failed to pass
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to Lopes Floor Amend to COM - Stevens
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Stevens Substitute Floor amendment to the Lopes Floor amendment, reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Stevens Substitute Floor amendment to the Lopes Floor amendment, reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
6-24 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
2572fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 4
June 15, 2009: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1