+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 321
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Cajero Bedford flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Lopez flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Lujan flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ERA - Olson
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ERA
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to ERA - Quezada
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Olson Floor Amendment; Reference to the EMPLOYMENT AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Olson Floor Amendment; Reference to the EMPLOYMENT AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2571approp_as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
May 2, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 15, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2012: Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor