+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 320
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: CFA
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Children and Family Affairs: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Children and Family Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Children and Family Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor