+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 176
- Action: Signed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: PS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-18 ps
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor