+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Ugenti-Rita flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - Udall - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Biasiucci moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O), House Bill 2570 be calendared for Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Representative Hoffman moved that the House reconsider House Bill 2570 within 14 days. Motion passed v/v.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 13, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
May 10, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 16, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 15, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 28, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor