+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Approp
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: TRANS - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to TRANS - Biggs
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Biggs Floor amendment, reference to the Transportation Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs Floor amendment, reference to the Transportation Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
January 24, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor