+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Majority caucus: H
- Minority caucus: H
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate first read
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:55 pm
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-2 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
January 19, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor