+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Hoffman - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
January 28, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor