+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 288
- Action: Signed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor