+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 337
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Court
- Amendment passed: HEIR
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Adopted Amendment
Court Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Court Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
House Adopted Amendment
3-17 ed_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-19 ed_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 7, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2011: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor