+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 270
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pm
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-13 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 6
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor