+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 172
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Miscellaneous motion
- Hb 2564 substituted for sb 1206 on third reading.
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Barto
- Amendment failed: Sub Floor Amend to Barto Floor Amend to Bill - Farley
- COW motion
- Lujan motion to include the farley substitute floor amendment to the barto floor amendment to the bill - failed
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Barto Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
February 19, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 19, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor