+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Approp
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2013: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor