+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House adopted conference committee report.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Conference committee recommendation: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: PETERSEN, BROPHY MCGEE, MENDEZ
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: BOYER, ALSTON, NORGAARD
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by ED - passed
- Floor Amend to bill - Boyer - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
April 16, 2018: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
March 26, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
March 1, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
February 6, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor