+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Discussed and held
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Approp
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Children and Family Affairs: Do pass
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Children and Family Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
February 5, 2015: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor