+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 9, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
February 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor