+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 216
- Action: Signed
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmit to Senate
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Vote detail 59 0 1 0 passed
- House adopts conference committee
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- Senate appointed: Yarbrough, Farley, Reagan
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- House appointed: Robson, Lovas, Mccune Davis
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref FIN)
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Robson
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 4:13 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Insurance and Retirement: Do pass
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Insurance and Retirement
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Robson Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Robson Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-22 fin_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
3-11 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 13, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2013: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 7, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 7, 2013: Insurance and Retirement: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor