+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 19, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor