+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Representative Cano motion requesting the Senate return HB2558.: PASSED
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
January 31, 2023: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 31, 2023: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 31, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor