+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Leach flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP - passed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Federal Relations Committee: do pass.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federal Relations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 14
February 27, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2019: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 4, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
February 4, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2019: House Federal Relations Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor