+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Kerr flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Water and Agriculture Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Water and Agriculture Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Powers Hannley - failed
- WM - passed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Land & Agriculture Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Land & Agriculture Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 24, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 57
May 15, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 4, 2019: Senate Water and Agriculture Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
February 5, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 5, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2019: House Land & Agriculture Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor