+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: failed to pass.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - passed
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2023: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 8
January 31, 2023: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 31, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor