+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2010: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor