+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by GE - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 28, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor