+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 129
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pmobject
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 29, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor