+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 5 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - JP Weiers
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate miscellaneous motion: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Miscellaneous motion
- Hb 2549 substituted for sb 1015. motion carried.
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:06 pmobject
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Jerry Weiers Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Jerry Weiers Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 10, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2011: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 1, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor