+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 174
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-22 hmlr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1