+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HB 2547 substituted for SB 1122. Motion carried.: Passed
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor