+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Borrelli flr amend (ref NRE) adopted
- NRE (ref Bill) adopted
- Pratt flr amend (ref NRE) adopted
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Finchem - passed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:20PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Federal Relations Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federal Relations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 24, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 20
May 15, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 27, 2019: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 30, 2019: House Federal Relations Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor