+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 322
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
- House adopt
- House final read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
- Senate adopt
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Allen C, Lopez, Verschoor
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions.
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- House appointed: Heinz, Ash, Goodale
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Allen C flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HHS - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HHS - Heinz
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (16)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen C flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Heinz Floor amendment; reference to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Allen C flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Heinz Floor amendment; reference to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
3-24 health_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
6-1 health_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
4-16 health_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
3-23 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 28, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2010: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
April 12, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 15, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 5
January 21, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor