+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- HB 2544 substituted for SB 1321. Motion carried.: Passed
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- ED
- SUB Floor Amend to ED - Boyer - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Education
House Proposed Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to ED - Boyer - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 27, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 27, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor