+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Livingston flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Salman - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 27
April 28, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 24, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 23, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 17
January 28, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8