+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Approp
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
February 3, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor