+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 20, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
February 6, 2018: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor