+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 336 rfeir
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed section 4
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed 4
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CE (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Senate first read
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ERA
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ERA - Yee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Commerce and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Yee Floor Amendment; reference to the Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-28 ce_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Employment and Regulatory Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Yee Floor Amendment; reference to the Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
3-14 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 8
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2011: Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 8, 2011: Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor