+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Vote detail 35 23 2 0 passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Representative townsend moved that the House reconsider hb2541 on tuesday, march 11th, 2014. motion passed by v/v
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-18 ps
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
March 12, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2014: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 5
February 5, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 5, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor