+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Stevens - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Failed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Stevens - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 27
March 3, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 8
January 27, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 27, 2016: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 27, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 27, 2016: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor