+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: Discussed and Held.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by ED - passed
- Amended by APPROP - withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 7, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 26, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
January 26, 2023: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 26, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8